MD HB453 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board to place a licensee on emeritus status under certain circumstances; requiring the Board, under certain circumstances, to reinstate the license of an individual who is on inactive or emeritus status; exempting licensees who are on inactive status or emeritus status from continuing medical education requirements; repealing the requirement that the Board issue a license to an individual who is on inactive status under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Inactive and Emeritus Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823728/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 320.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |