MD HB452 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Washington County to employ one or more County Attorneys; requiring the salaries for a County Attorney to be set in the annual county budget; authorizing the County Commissioners to employ attorneys; authorizing the Office of the County Attorney to perform specified duties; authorizing the Office of the County Attorney, under specified circumstances, to hire temporarily special counsel to perform specified duties; and repealing language made obsolete by the Act.
Title
Washington County - Office of the County Attorney
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-04 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Environmental Matters |