MD HB451 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purposes of the Neighborhood Business Development Program to include helping to create specified small businesses and other food-related enterprises in food deserts; requiring the Business Development Program in the Neighborhood Business Development Program to provide financial assistance to projects in food deserts; authorizing specified entities to apply for financial assistance for a project in a food desert under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-25) (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-25) (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-25) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {723727/1 Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {570917/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Food
Grants
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Loans
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Food
Grants
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Loans
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business