MD HB45 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit; altering the annual interest rate paid by a mobile home park owner on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-2) (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640514/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2012-11-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Reports
Security Deposits
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Reports
Security Deposits