MD HB449 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the County Council of Baltimore County, by ordinance, to impose development impact fees to finance the capital costs of additional or expanded public works, improvements, and facilities required to accommodate new construction or development; and requiring money collected through development impact fees used to finance the capital costs of certain public works, improvements, and facilities to be used within the surrounding community of the construction or development for which the development impact fee is imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-12) (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (122-12)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {230818/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-18HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback