MD HB449 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on or before October 1, 2016, to adopt regulations to provide for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State; prohibiting specified regulations adopted by the Department from becoming effective until October 1, 2017; prohibiting the Department from issuing a permit to authorize the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State until October 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {653624/1 Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel01) {673227/1 Rejected (41-93) (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {363920/1 Rejected (50-88) (Y: 50 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {303124/1 Rejected (47-92) (Y: 47 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McKay01) {303425/1 Rejected (43-95) (Y: 43 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {903121/1 Rejected (47-93) (Y: 47 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {593620/1 Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {183028/2 Rejected (47-93) (Y: 47 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {653624/1 Rejected (52-84) (Y: 52 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel01) {673227/1 Rejected (41-93) (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {363920/1 Rejected (50-88) (Y: 50 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {303124/1 Rejected (47-92) (Y: 47 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McKay01) {303425/1 Rejected (43-95) (Y: 43 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {903121/1 Rejected (47-93) (Y: 47 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {593620/1 Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {183028/2 Rejected (47-93) (Y: 47 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481 |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-33) |
2015-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {463528/1 Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {214533/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-45) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {653624/1 Rejected (52-84) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {673227/1 Rejected (41-93) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {363920/1 Rejected (50-88) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {303124/1 Rejected (47-92) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McKay) {303425/1 Rejected (43-95) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {903121/1 Rejected (47-93) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {593620/1 Rejected (49-88) |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {183028/2 Rejected (47-93) |
2015-03-23 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {110711/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Notices
Pollution
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Wells
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Notices
Pollution
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Wells