MD HB448 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain health care practitioners to establish a practitioner-patient relationship through telehealth interactions; requiring a health care practitioner providing telehealth services to be held to the same standards of practice that are applicable to in-person settings and, if clinically appropriate, provide or refer a patient for in-patient services or another type of telehealth service; prohibiting a health care practitioner from prescribing a certain opiate through telehealth except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth and Shortage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15
2020-03-17HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (131-2)
2020-03-17HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {983426/2 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2020-03-15SenateMotion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {383622/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {184632/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-09SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (130-6)
2020-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {956186/1 Adopted
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB402 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations11001(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations11002(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations11003(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations11004(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations11005(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations11006(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0448?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0448f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0448t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0448e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/Chapters_noln/CH_15_hb0448e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0448_95618601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0448_18463201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0448_38362201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0448_98342602.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0448_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0448_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0362.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0954.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0854.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback