MD HB447 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to provide grants to eligible counties to establish or improve pretrial services programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; requiring certain distributions from the Fund to be used to supplement and not supplant certain other funds; establishing the requirements for a certain pretrial services program; etc.
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-11) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-43) (Y: 90 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-43) (Y: 90 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-11) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-43) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {402517/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary and Appropriations) |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Chemical Tests
Comptroller
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Pretrial Detention or Release
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Treasurers
Chemical Tests
Comptroller
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Pretrial Detention or Release
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Treasurers