MD HB446 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a plaintiff or the holder of a certificate of sale in a foreclosure action may be reimbursed for reasonable attorney's fees up to $1,200 for opening an estate for specified purposes; and providing that a plaintiff or holder of a certificate of sale in a foreclosure action may be reimbursed up to $1,200, under specified circumstances, for expenses incurred for opening an estate for specified purposes.
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {425367/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Bankruptcy
Estates and Trusts
Foreclosure
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Bankruptcy
Estates and Trusts
Foreclosure
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property