MD HB443 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Agriculture or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp if the industrial hemp is grown or cultivated for agricultural research or academic research purposes; requiring a site used by the Department or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp to be certified by and registered with the Department; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Agricultural or Academic Research
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880814/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Farmland
Higher Education
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Agriculture, Department of
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Farmland
Higher Education
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sunset