MD HB441 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to convene a task force to study and make recommendations on the adoption of a unique Maryland Identification Number for each registered or licensed business in the State to be used by certain State agencies; requiring the task force to include representatives of certain State agencies; authorizing the task force to include representatives of certain other State agencies; providing for the duties of the task force; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2021-02-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {165160/1 Adopted
2021-02-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB366 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-18 - Referred Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback