MD HB441 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a 2-year period of time during which a county government is not required to reimburse the State for outstanding debt service for specified school buildings that are transferred to a county government; and requiring a county government to reimburse the State for a specified amount of outstanding debt service for specified school buildings after the 2-year period of time has elapsed.
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Counties
Debt Management
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Time
Debt Management
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Time