MD HB440 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1036
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to schedule a hearing on a certain petition regarding the proposed relocation of a child who is the subject of a custody or visitation order on an expedited basis under certain circumstances.
Title
Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing (Assurance of Child's Safety Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Charles [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Aaron Kaufman [D] |
Del. Cheryl Pasteur [D] | Del. Scott Phillips [D] | Del. Kym Taylor [D] | Del. Karen Toles [D] |
Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173420/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB42 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
HB1036 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1036 (Carry Over) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 9 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |