MD HB44 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a transfer of real property from a sole proprietorship to a limited liability company from recordation and transfer taxes if the sole member of the limited liability company is identical to the converting sole proprietor and specified other conditions are met.
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-10-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Exemptions
Land Records
Limited Liability Companies
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Land Records
Limited Liability Companies
Real Property
Recordation
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax