MD HB44 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to use specified penalties or fines that are paid into the Maryland Clean Water Fund to restore specified areas associated with the penalty or fine; restricting the use of specified penalties or fines for administrative purposes; making technical changes; etc.
Title
Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Uses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2012-11-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Conservation
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Water