MD HB437 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 7 to 30 days the time period that a local state of emergency may continue or be renewed without the consent of the local governing body.
Title
Local States of Emergency - Time Period - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |