MD HB437 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a home builder at the time of offering new homes in a subdivision for sale to offer minimum visitability features as an option for purchase under specified circumstances; requiring a specified offer of minimum visitability features to be accompanied by a specified document and a specified drawing or photograph; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Title
Real Property - Sales of New Homes - Minimum Visitability Features
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Del. Doyle Niemann [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (101-37) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-07 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Environmental Matters |