MD HB433 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date to December 31 by which Somerset County is required to file a certain financial report with the Department of Legislative Services and report the results of a certain audit with the Legislative Auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing Date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback