MD HB433 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying what constitutes good cause for the purposes of removal of a certified minority business enterprise after the execution of a contract; prohibiting the failure of a certified minority business to provide a specified bond from being considered nonperformance; altering a requirement that specified units structure specified procurement procedures to achieve a specified minimum percentage of the unit's total dollar value of specified contracts to be made directly to small businesses; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {726088/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Fees
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Fees
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Small Business
State Government - Procurement