MD HB430 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget a certain appropriation from all fund sources for the Child Care Subsidy Program each fiscal year; requiring the Governor to appropriate funds from all fund sources in the State budget to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rates to a certain amount in certain fiscal years; etc.
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {954262/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |