MD HB430 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "motor vehicle" to expand the types of vehicles for which an occupant is prohibited from consuming or possessing an alcoholic beverage in the passenger area while on a highway.
Title
Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Highways
Mopeds
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Highways
Mopeds
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving