MD HB43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $50,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-07SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {145467/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-01-17HouseHearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2017-07-19HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback