MD HB43 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from willfully and knowingly preventing, hindering, or delaying a person who has a lawful right to sign a petition from signing a petition through the use of fraud, duress, or force.
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |