MD HB43 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing serious emotional distress to another by intentionally placing on the Internet a specified reproduction of the image of the other person knowing that the other person did not consent to the placement of the image on the Internet under specified circumstances; providing that a specified interactive computer service is not liable under the Act for content provided by another person; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {423220/1 Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {692615/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Harassment
Liability
Motion Pictures
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pornography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Harassment
Liability
Motion Pictures
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pornography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video