MD HB43 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing termination provisions and altering dates of applicability for specified tax credits for employers that hire qualifying individuals with disabilities; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, the Department of Disabilities, and the Department of Veterans Affairs make every effort to promote and market the Qualifying Employees with Disabilities Tax Credit to Maryland employers; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Glen Glass [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {555866/1 Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {735264/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2012-10-31 | House | Pre-filed |