MD HB43 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a law making a specified appropriation shall be subject to rejection or repeal by the voters of the State under the petition referendum process provided under the Maryland Constitution; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Maryland Constitution - Laws Making an Appropriation Made Subject to Petition
Sponsors
Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] |
Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2011-10-20 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0043.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0043f.pdf |