MD HB429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the owner or operator of a place of public accommodation or an agent or employee of the owner or operator from selling or offering for sale certain substantially similar products or services if the products or services are priced differently based on gender; and providing that a certain violation is within the scope of the enforcement duties and powers of the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General.
Title
Human Relations - Places of Public Accommodation - Pricing of Goods and Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Gender
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Gender
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |