MD HB429 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Mar 28 @ 12:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a yellow or amber light or signal device on a certain tow truck that is manufactured on or after October 1, 2019, to use a light-emitting diode; and requiring a certain tow truck to display reflective paint or markings in a certain location on the vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {810018/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback