MD HB428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a special comprehensive audit of the procurement practices and contracts of the Baltimore County public school system to determine whether certain acts occurred during the time period from January 1, 2012, to June 30, 2018, both inclusive; and requiring the audit to focus on certain procurement practices, certain contracts, interactions between certain persons and vendors, and compliance with certain ethics standards and requirements.
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Baltimore County Public School System - Special Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore County
Contracts
Education - Local Bills
Ethics
Legislative Services, Department of
Procurement
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Baltimore County
Contracts
Education - Local Bills
Ethics
Legislative Services, Department of
Procurement
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology