MD HB428 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-20)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Smith, Zirkin, and Hough
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, under specified circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; prohibiting the court from terminating parental rights under specified circumstances; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely specified rights and responsibilities of a parent; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)

Sponsors

Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Steven Arentz [R]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Mary Carozza [R]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. William Folden [R]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]
Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Robin Grammer [R]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]
Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]
Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]
Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]
Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]
Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. April Rose [R]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]
Del. Chris West [R]Del. Brett Wilson [R]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. William Wivell [R]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSenators Smith, Zirkin, and Hough
2017-04-10SenateConference Committee Appointed
2017-04-10SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2017-04-10HouseDelegates Moon, Vallario, and B. Wilson
2017-04-10HouseConference Committee Appointed
2017-04-10HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2017-04-10HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2017-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {138476/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {902110/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-26HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0428&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0428f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0428t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0428_90211001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0428_13847601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0428.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0428_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0428_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0428,h-0328&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0428,s-1194&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback