MD HB425 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the County Commissioners of Somerset County to appropriate to certain organized volunteer fire companies in the county certain amounts for certain fiscal years; requiring that the appropriations required for a certain fiscal year remain in effect for subsequent fiscal years unless altered by a future enactment.
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990311/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |