MD HB425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified organizations to hold casino events that may include a card game or roulette in Howard County, as specified; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Howard County Department of Inspections, Licenses, and Permits before operating a casino event; authorizing a permit holder under this Act to charge only a preset entrance fee; requiring participants in a casino event to use tokens and not cash for wagering under specified circumstances; requiring a permit holder to submit a financial report; etc.
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246 |
2015-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2015-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {269234/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385569/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
County Councils
County Executives
Fees
Fire Protection
Gaming
Howard County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Volunteers
County Councils
County Executives
Fees
Fire Protection
Gaming
Howard County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Volunteers