MD HB424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain rate of interest on certain member contributions in active members' nonvested accounts in the State Retirement and Pension System if the members have not withdrawn contributions from the nonvested accounts and are not eligible to receive a certain vested allowance; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Nonvested Accounts - Regular Interest
Sponsors
Del. Karen Simpson [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Adrian Boafo [D] | Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D] |
Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. Lesley Lopez [D] | Del. Gary Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233 |
2023-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {463123/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {603526/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Subjects
Interest
Judges
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Judges
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 22 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 23 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 24 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 25 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 27 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |