MD HB420 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making individuals who are eligible for in-State financial aid eligible for a Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Educational Excellence Award and part-time grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-51) (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (30-16)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (85-51)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback