MD HB420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, under specified circumstances, from authorizing work activities centers and specified sheltered workshops to pay employees with disabilities less than a specified minimum wage; authorizing specified work activities centers and specified sheltered workshops to pay new employees less than the minimum wage only under specified circumstances; requiring the Developmental Disabilities Administration and the Department of Disabilities to develop and implement a specified plan; etc.
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-29) (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-23) (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-23) (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-29) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {537872/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-23) |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383191/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-02 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discrimination
Equipment
Federal Government
Health
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Mental Health
Partnerships
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discrimination
Equipment
Federal Government
Health
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Mental Health
Partnerships
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment