MD HB42 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing the time periods within which a custodian is required to grant or deny a certain application to inspect a public record and produce a public record in response to an approved application; altering the circumstances under which and the time period within which a custodian is required to indicate certain information in writing or by e-mail; decreasing from 10 to 5 working days, the time period within which a custodian who denies the application is required to give the applicant a certain written statement; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Applications for Inspection - Responses and Time Limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-09-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB67 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Subjects
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Inspections
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Inspections
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0042?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0042f.pdf |