MD HB418 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-23 - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or before December 31, 2021, each county board of education to adopt a policy prohibiting the use or display of a symbol of hate under certain circumstances; requiring the policy to prohibit the display of a symbol of hate on clothing, book bags, folders, or similar items; providing an exception to the policy to allow a symbol of hate to be used as an example in a course of study; and requiring a county board to develop and distribute certain educational materials regarding the policy to each public school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-07-27HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback