MD HB418 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering to 2.5% the percentage of the renewable energy portfolio standard that must be derived from solar energy for a municipal electric utility in Frederick County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB559 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7703(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback