MD HB418 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual who adopts a cat or dog from an animal shelter or a rescue facility a maximum credit of $100 against the State income tax; providing that an individual may not claim the credit for more than 1 taxable year with respect to the same cat or dog; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |