MD HB417 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing funds in the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for the costs associated with the purchase of specified nutrient load reductions, not to exceed a specified amount per year in specified years; requiring the load reductions purchased under the Act to be consistent with specified accounting procedures; requiring the Department of the Environment on or before October 1, 2020, to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; etc.
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624630/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {460017/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Water
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Water