MD HB415 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Character Education Fund in the State Department of Education; requiring the Governor to include a specified amount in the State budget each fiscal year for the Fund; establishing the grant eligibility requirements for the Fund; requiring the Department to adopt specified criteria for approving character education programs, decide whether to approve a proposed program by specified dates, and make specified grant awards by specified dates; etc.
Title
Education - Character Education Fund
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Justin Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Public Schools
Reports
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Public Schools
Reports
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0415.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0415f.pdf |