MD HB413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing in Montgomery County the requirement that a local jurisdiction publish notice of the location of a speed monitoring system in a newspaper of general circulation.
Title
Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Publication of Notice MC 19-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-19) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Information
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Notices
Public Information
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |