MD HB413 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Information Systems in the Department of Legislative Services to establish the Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming; establishing that the purpose of the Pilot Program is to determine an efficient and cost-effective process for providing the public with closed captioning for live and archived video streaming on the Maryland General Assembly Web site; requiring the Office of Information Systems to report the results to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Motion to place bill on Third Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {726485/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Information
Recordings
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Information
Recordings
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video