MD HB413 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a special wine festival (WF) license in Washington County; requiring that an applicant for a special WF license must be a holder of another license; specifying that a holder of a special WF license may display and sell wine in a specified manner; providing for a $20 license fee; authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to choose 2 weekends annually for wine festivals; requiring the Board to choose specified locations for the wine festivals; etc.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Festival License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-04 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Washington County