MD HB411 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an open investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with, if the officer knew or should have known that the person is a victim, witness, or suspect, is requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties, or is in the custody of the officer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {422119/1 Adopted
2021-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-09-21HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB43 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback