MD HB410 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation; requiring the Task Force, by November 1, 2019, to report its findings and to make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the preventing plastic bottles and other debris from entering storm drains and stormwater inlets; etc.
Title
Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Flood Control
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Reports
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Transportation - Highways
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Flood Control
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Reports
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Transportation - Highways