MD HB41 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a cooperative housing corporation, a condominium, and a homeowners association to register annually with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; exempting specified common ownership communities from the applicability of the Act; establishing a Common Ownership Community Registry in the Department; requiring the Department to work with any county that maintains a local registry of common ownership communities; establishing a maximum annual registration fee of $10 per year; etc.
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-39) (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-89) (Y: 48 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-89) (Y: 48 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-39) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-89) |
2017-02-17 | House | Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2017-02-15 | House | Special Order until 2/16 (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2017-02-15 | House | Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) |
2017-02-14 | House | Special Order until 2/15 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990618/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-06-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Counties
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Fines
Forms
Homeowners Associations
Privacy
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Counties
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Fines
Forms
Homeowners Associations
Privacy
Real Property
Registration
Reports