MD HB409 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully allowing an individual under 21 years old to possess or consume an alcoholic beverage at a residence the person owns or leases and in which the person resides or furnishing an alcoholic beverage for consumption to an individual under 21 years old if the adult knew or reasonably should have known the individual would operate a motor vehicle and did operate the vehicle under the influence of alcohol and caused serious injury or death; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Providing Alcohol to Underage Drinkers - Penalties (Alex and Calvin's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-15) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (O'Donnell) Rejected (45-92) (Y: 45 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (123-15)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11HouseMotion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (45-92)
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2016-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {358970/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (136-3)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {462917/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-02-24HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-29HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0409?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0409f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0409t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0409e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_513_hb0409e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0409_46291701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0409_35897001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0409.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0409_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0409_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0409,h-0496&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0409,s-1274&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0409,h-1415&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0409,h-1416&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback