MD HB407 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Sheriff of Garrett County to establish a pretrial release program that offers alternatives to pretrial detention and adopt certain regulations; authorizing a court to order a certain individual to participate in the pretrial release program; authorizing the court to make the order at a certain time; providing for eligibility for the pretrial release program; authorizing the Sheriff to establish and direct a certain work release program; authorizing the Sheriff to establish and administer a home detention program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback