MD HB407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a general hospice care program, when providing services in an in-home setting, to establish a written unused prescription medication collection and disposal policy that includes certain provisions; requiring an employee of a general hospice care program, as soon as practicable, to collect and dispose of a certain patient's unused prescription medication under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876589/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assisted Living
Death
Drugs
Health Occupations
Hospices
Liability
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Health
Records
Refuse Disposal
Safety
Witnesses
Assisted Living
Death
Drugs
Health Occupations
Hospices
Liability
Nursing Homes
Patients
Public Health
Records
Refuse Disposal
Safety
Witnesses